Trustees NORTH DOWNS COMMUNITY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 1183074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Mary Deverill | Chair | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chai-Lin Larmer | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joanna Scheck | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Diana Felicity Pharoah | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Spencer | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marian Atkinson | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Clare Colbourne | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ellis | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wiseman | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ANNE CATTERMOLE | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.