Accounts and annual returns GUIDING LIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1183421
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window