Trustees YATE MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1184340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Howard Quentin Rayner Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Andrew James Wybrow Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Martin Charlton Trustee 19 July 2021
BROADWAY INFANT SCHOOL FUND
Overdue by 1013 days
Stephen John Sherliker Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Nigel Stephen Woodford Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record
David John Musgrove Trustee 04 July 2019
ROYAL AIRFORCES ASSOCIATION, BRISTOL BRANCH
Received: On time
Danny James Edward Parker Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record