Governing document CAPPELLA NOVOCASTRIENSIS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/1960 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/1961 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/1969 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1983 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1987 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2014 as amended on 24 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.