Trustees THE TWO CASTLES MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1183403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Mills Chair 13 September 2023
None on record
Brian Kenneth Perkins Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Philip Allington Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Stephen Buswell Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
John Griffiths Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record