Trustees FORCES ONLINE CIO
Charity number: 1188955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Ellaway | Chair | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Breen | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Barlow MBCS | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kolawole David Olugboyega OLAGBAIYE | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Shields | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mann | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean McCallum | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Hugh McMullen | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.