Accounts and annual returns THE MONKEYPUZZLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1184349
Charity reporting is up to date (121 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 277 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 November 2022 | 642 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
09 November 2022 | 642 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window