IVO DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 514238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.57k £12.37k £9.36k £13.60k £20.06k
Total expenditure £12.19k £10.05k £9.26k £21.78k £18.62k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £2.48k