UNIQUE KNOWLEDGE SEEKERS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1184741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hawwa Mbombo Chair 22 July 2020 None on record
Tahreem Sabir Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Mohammed Nooruddeen Uthmaan Hamani Trustee 07 January 2019 None on record
Zohal Amini Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record
Beverley Thorpe-Raghdo Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record