Trustees GLOBAL GOALS CENTRE
Charity number: 1187048
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen John Roser | Chair | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Dainton | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rodney Thomas Garrett | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Sargood | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Miran | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Deans MBE | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Kathryn Eades | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Diana Pitt | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alix Nigel Hughes | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.