Trustees ABACUS BELSIZE PTA

Charity number: 1184490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alberta Anticoli Trustee 28 June 2022
None on record
Sarolta Blanar Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Anne Christine Fregerslev Nierhoff Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
Dorene Kit Poh Niotakis Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Darla Rose Hocking Trustee 12 April 2019
None on record