Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY SAMLESBURY
Charity number: 514394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Tonge | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annie Ryder | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norma Thorpe | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAT DARLING | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN TOON | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jolly | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER PROFIT | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN SHEARMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.