PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. LUKE & ST. JOHN, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1184357
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Bate Slade Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Stephen John Skett Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Juliette Elisabeth Moxham Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Jennifer Ruth Sykes Mrs Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Jonathan Andrew Chestney Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Emma Victoria Perona-Wright Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Christine Ann Lodge Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
Carla Thraves Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Peter John Burke Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
TERENCE HOWARD Trustee 30 April 2019
THE ST LUKE AND ST JOHN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
REV PATRICK EDWARD WHEATON Chair 28 February 2016
THE ST LUKE AND ST JOHN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
Peter David Ralphs Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Victoria Beevers Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record