Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, EGHAM HYTHE
Charity number: 1184186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE RUTH OLIVER | Chair | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Josh Cleaver | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Louise Oxenham | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Selwyn Delano Boothe | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joy Rule | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Johnson Walker McGovern | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Baynes | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Diplock | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosemary Claire Hoad | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Michelle Sterry | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Mary Loveday | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Roshier | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.