Trustees TELSCOMBE CLIFFS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Charity number: 1188569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Shepherd | Chair | 01 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kathleen Burch | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Graham Hunter | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Patricia Gillott | Trustee | 01 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Yvonne Barritt | Trustee | 01 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Watts | Trustee | 01 May 1990 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.