Trustees LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM FRIENDS
Charity number: 1185277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Frederick Dewick | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth McKay | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Southgate | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivia Carlton OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Edwin Miller | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elaine Gilbert | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Green | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Andrew Thrower | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry LeJeune | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.