Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, KINGTON
Charity number: 1185453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Bowdler | Chair | 08 April 1985 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Sell | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret H Pengelly | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Robinson | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lacey | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Halcrow | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jayne Horne | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Fensom | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert MacCurrach | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sell | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcom Price | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Cooke BSc | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Cooke | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Valentine Thomas | Trustee | 15 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Buckingham | Trustee | 15 June 1998 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE HALCROW | Trustee | 10 April 1996 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 08 April 1991 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.