Trustees JAMIE - FOREVER12
Charity number: 1186344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Elsom | Chair | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Storey | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wilson | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elena Wilson | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Montgomery | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Gibson | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Winter | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Letitia Winter | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Horgan | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Larraine Sargeant | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Butterfield | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Brown | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hetherington | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Jarrett | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adeline Winter | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.