Accounts and annual returns LEWES FESTIVAL OF SONG

Charity number: 1185478
Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 321 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 05 May 2024 280 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 10 August 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window