Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND HOLY APOSTLES, SCARBOROUGH
Charity number: 1186990

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Richard Walker | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
William Michael Graham Stuart | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH REVELL | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hannah Madin | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jacob Madin | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brand | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Witty | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Frances Doble | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Corrie | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kinsella | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Ascott | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitehead | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Foster | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dickens | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Charles Wells | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Deborah Simms | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Arleen Ingham | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN COURTNEY | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ANGELA COURTNEY | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.