Governing document ST WILLIAM'S FOUNDATION
Charity number: 514817
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEPTEMBER 1995, 6 JUNE 1997, 7TH OCTOBER 2000 AND 20TH FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE STUDY OF EMERGING TRENDS IN INDUSTRY AND EMPLOYMENT WITHIN A COMMUNITY CONTEXT AND THEIR RELATIONSHIP TO EDUCATION, AND BY THE CREATION AND PURSUIT OF IDEAS AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR DEVELOPING CLOSER LINKS BETWEEN INDUSTRY AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTHERN COUNTIES OF ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.