Financial history MENTAL HEALTH MATTERS

Charity number: 514829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.38m £12.62m £12.99m £14.83m £17.81m
Total expenditure £10.85m £11.91m £12.69m £14.27m £17.54m
Income from government contracts £8.71m £831.03k £11.12m £13.05m £15.73m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £41.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.04k £10.45k £9.86k £13.36k £23.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.37m £12.58m £12.96m £14.80m £17.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.89k £1.27k £1.71k £4.25k £0
Income - Other £4.66k £29.86k £16.47k £12.57k £9.99k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.85m £11.91m £12.69m £14.27m £17.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £83.22k £77.02k £73.43k £72.94k £75.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0