Financial history THE WILLIAM NICHOLAS CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 514929
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6 £4 £4 £2 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.15k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A