NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1185965
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lindsay Mary Gee Trustee 14 May 2019
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
FRANCES LANGLEY Trustee 10 April 2014
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Rachael Maria Black Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Helen Lane Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Margaret Ellison BAHons Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
LINDA CARISS Trustee 09 May 2017
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Janet Marjorie Oddy Trustee 08 May 2018 None on record
Gillian Margaret Cressey Trustee 10 April 2014
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
JEAN WILLIAMS Trustee 14 April 2016
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Sarah Wishart McFarlane BSc Chair 14 April 2016 None on record
Audrey Marigold Wilkinson Trustee 26 March 2015
NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time