Trustees OXFORD CONSERVATION VOLUNTEERS
Charity number: 1186114
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Skepper | Chair | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Bulford | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Fishwick | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dariusz Maton | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carla Ponte Julio | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cossutta | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Hunter | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Elliot Bricknell | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Louise Hill | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Bletsoe | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.