Trustees GLENDALE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1187662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Dennis Hurst | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Edward Hume Hargreave | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Straker | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Esther Watson | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Armstrong Brown | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Stawart Kinsey | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frederick Murray | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Euan Francis Gibson | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.