Governing document SHREWSBURY STAFF WELFARE SOCIETY
Charity number: 515004
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1935 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 1983, 22 FEBRUARY 1984, 27 FEBRUARY 1985, 6 AUGUST 2007 AND 21 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS EMPLOYED BY THE ROYAL MAIL AT SHREWSBURY SORTING OFFICE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SHREWSBURY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.