Trustees WINSCOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1186290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caryn Joanne Ritchie | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Smith | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Payne | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Saunders | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Annette Joy Clements | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Janet Elaine O'Brien | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Thresher | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda TURNER | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TURNER | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian Vibert | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.