Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, TOLLINGTON PARK
Charity number: 1186310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Golding | Chair | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henriett Hadler | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Omofunmilayo Sulaiman | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Ashford Down | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clement Adebayo | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tyler Overton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Mason | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel D'Souza | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Porter | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe McDonald | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Porter | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Nyamah | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aurore Down | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Inge Diamond | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Mason | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Thomas Waters | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.