Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS CHURCH COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1188741
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 114 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window