Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PETWORTH

Charity number: 1188604
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Mark Gilbert Chair 01 September 2015
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
CHICHESTER DIOCESAN PILGRIMAGE COMMITTEE
Received: 71 days late
Alan James Franklin Sutton Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Nicholas Neil Wheeler Trustee 11 May 2021
LEE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PETWORTH SOCIETY
Received: 63 days late
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PETWORTH
Overdue by 105 days
Carole Ann Field Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Ruth Margaret Sneller Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Derek William Rudge Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Victor Walter Constable Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Jill Easton BSc Hons. Trustee 16 April 2020
None on record
Judith Penny Howard Trustee 16 April 2020
None on record
Brian Trevor Parr Trustee 09 April 2019
None on record
Eileen Patricia Lintill Trustee 09 April 2019
LEE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SYLVIA BEAUFOY CENTRE
Received: On time
Matthew Henry Cooke Trustee 09 April 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Margaret Smith Trustee 19 April 2017
PETWORTH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JEAN DOROTHY HUGGETT Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Andrew Charles Howard Trustee 19 April 2016
NORTHCHAPEL, PETWORTH AND TILLINGTON ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE PETWORTH COTTAGE TRUST
Received: On time