Trustees TONIC MUSIC FOR MENTAL HEALTH LTD

Charity number: 1189913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Terence Priestley Mr Trustee 14 December 2022
None on record
Gloria Lynette Miller Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Geoffery Steward Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Matthew Leonard Shires Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
Stephen Matthew Curtis Mr Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Abigail Charlotte Emilia Amey Trustee 04 April 2019
THE RADNOR CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Victoria Ann Barwood Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record