Trustees DANESBOROUGH CHORUS
Charity number: 1188026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Liddie | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WOOD | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Imogen Allen | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Roberts | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN GORDON SMITH | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Marie Clare Rees | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN SNELLING | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.