ELSTREE AND DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity number: 1189643
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Joseph Pugh Trustee 11 April 2019
BOREHAMWOOD SWIMMING CLUB Recently registered
Robert Harris Trustee 29 March 2019 None on record
David Arthur Cox Trustee 15 June 2020
COETMOR MILL TRUST Received: 2 days late
Julie Brennan Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
DAWN ELIZABETH DAVEY Trustee 15 June 2020
7TH BOREHAMWOOD SCOUT GROUP
Gemma Norman Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Fatma Mussa Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Moley Brown Chair 23 January 2020 None on record
David Smith Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record