THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. OSWIN'S WYLAM

Charity number: 1187983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE TEASDALE Trustee 28 March 2004 None on record
Dr Peter James Tayler MA MRCP FR Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Professor Lesley Karen Twomey Trustee 30 April 2017
NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN EDUCATION BOARD Received: On time
Janet Ruby Palmer Trustee 27 March 2012 None on record
Lynette Gail Atkinson Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Philip John Appleby Trustee 24 March 2015 None on record
Rev Angus Palmer Trustee 12 April 2011 None on record
Angela Ruth Cairns Trustee 20 March 2016
THE DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS Received: On time
Karen Anne Webster Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Michelle Andrena Coleman Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Michael Bird Trustee 25 April 2021
THE TYNE MARINERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION Received: On time
Rev Thomas David Keith Birch Chair 18 September 2017 None on record
Hilda Rosemary Cook BA SRN Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Fiona Alice Oomes Trustee 04 April 2006 None on record
Robin Meryl Piette Trustee 12 April 2011
WYLAM INSTITUTE COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time
WYLAM WOMENS INSTITUTE Received: On time
Michael Gibbney F.C.I.B. Trustee 01 April 2001
ROTARY CLUB OF TYNEDALE TRUST FUND Received: On time