Trustees DREAM BIG TRUST
Charity number: 1190362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Birch | Chair | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Chabala | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Saunders | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Grantham | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liberty Rose Hogg | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Walker | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Aimee Dyble | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.