Financial history JOHN BUTTERWICK TRUST DAY CARE CENTRE AND HOSPICE

Charity number: 515705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £27.74k £163 £1.48k £843 £103
Total expenditure £56.36k £56.36k £57.85k £57.23k £56.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A