Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S CHURCH WESTHAMPNETT
Charity number: 1191476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV'D RACHEL HAWES | Chair | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Hazel Mary Bate | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Henry Gerald Bate | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joy Susan Smith | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Coombes | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Diane Edwards J.P. | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Scott | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Kent | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony John Curtiss Freeman M.A. | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Bradley | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lilian Stone | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.