Trustees BATH SPA UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1189547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasmine Raymond-Barker | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amber Rosina Daw | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elise Amber Booth | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Dumitru | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seb Dee | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Jay Mannino | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ming Hui Ng | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neetu Karwal | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Blake-Burke | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bold | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell James Steven Thomas | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Ellicott | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.