Financial history THE WATSON PLAYERS

Charity number: 515865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.44k £23.90k £6.28k £23.47k £1.42k
Total expenditure £21.88k £24.49k £19.51k £21.21k £4.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A