Trustees WALTHAM FOREST MIGRANT ACTION
Charity number: 1189600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Rose Seacombe | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tahreem Noor | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Rooney | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Anna Powell | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Creina Lilburne MA | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
CLIVE BOWER | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Inbar Tamari | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Minter | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jean Christine King MBE | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.