Trustees TY HAPUS
Charity number: 1191582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Francis Pickering | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Connelly | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES COLIN LONG | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Glenville Williams | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rhys Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ann Hitt | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Justine Anna Pickering MBE | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Leyshon | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Leanne Marlborough Rochefort-Shugar | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Olajumoke Anke Scott | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.