Accounts and annual returns COUNTRYSIDE ACCESS

Charity number: 1189195
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window