READ EASY HACKNEY

Charity number: 1190737
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cheryl Pelteret Trustee 17 February 2020 None on record
Shireen Bobat Chair 01 March 2021 None on record
Bella McElwain Trustee 04 May 2021 None on record
Mx Lisa Schmidt Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
Alison Margaret Kahn Trustee 03 March 2021 None on record
Anna Trento Trustee 07 March 2018 None on record
Abigail White Trustee 07 March 2018 None on record