Trustees 1ST DAVYHULME SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 516022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nash | Chair | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Jones | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Jason James | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara ann Spear | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Chatterton | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Behan | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Culleton | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andy Spear | Trustee | 01 August 1981 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.