Trustees THE STOCKPORT SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 516159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lesley Anne Selby | Chair | 04 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Joanna Kane | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Haigh | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hossle-Standring | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Craig Eastwood | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DAVIDSON LUND | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEONORA ROSE JOHNSTON | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ROBIN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.