ANNETTE FOX LEUKAEMIA RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 516208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £85.78k £45.63k £47.26k £46.51k £11.24k
Total expenditure £69.02k £81.38k £135.69k £135.89k £120.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A