Trustees PORTINSCALE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 516324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Pratt | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Catherine Goodall | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marie Baker | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Clague | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Diane Thompson | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Susannah Howarth | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Anne Marritt | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Pratt | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Marritt | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Quainton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHY COLAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.