CLEVELAND AND TEESSIDE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 516363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.66k £2.46k £3.70k £2.74k £1.57k
Total expenditure £2.97k £3.39k £4.89k £3.97k £957
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A