Trustees BRIGHOUSE WEST YORKSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1191435
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DERYCK HILLAS Chair 01 January 2020
HALIFAX MEETING HOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Suzie Bogle Trustee 13 March 2022
None on record
DAWN BECK Trustee 13 March 2021
HALIFAX MEETING HOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Jane Morris Trustee 01 January 2020
HEBDEN BRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD
Received: On time
WAINSGATE CHAPEL
Recently registered
Jeanette Hattersley Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Rebecca Mattingly Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Christopher Greaves Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
DAVID PROVIS Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record